U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01261
  • Case Name: Herndon v. One Source The Background Check Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 23, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2023: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 05, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • December 22, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Electronic Filing Registration Form in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • December 02, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • November 23, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 23, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 23, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.