U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02501
  • Case Name: Edgar et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Seal or Redact Document(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Conventionally]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to File Conventionally]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
  • April 28, 2025: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED MOTION]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
  • April 24, 2025: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal or Redact Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Seal or Redact Document(s)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
  • April 10, 2025: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED MOTION]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Enforce]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 11, 2023: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 09, 2023: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 03, 2023: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • December 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 06, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.