U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-03022
  • Case Name: Burch v. Kansas, State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Setting Status Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 10, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 04, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 02, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Ruling]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • January 24, 2023: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Service]
  • January 24, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 24, 2023: [Service]
  • January 24, 2023: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • January 24, 2023: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.