U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02121
  • Case Name: National Union Fire Insurance Co. v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Setting Status Conference]
  • March 27, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2025: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend Complaint]
  • September 26, 2024: [Amend Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.