U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02068
  • Case Name: Tobler et al v. 1248 Holdings, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 02, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.