U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02422
  • Case Name: Dorsey v. Topeka, Kansas, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 12, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
  • May 01, 2025: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits in Support of Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 10, 2025: [Exhibits]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 10, 2025: [Leave]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Discovery Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.