U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02202
  • Case Name: HappyFeet-Legends International, Inc. v. Holdaway et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Trial Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2025
  • January 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 01, 2024: [Response to Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • September 27, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • September 26, 2024: [Return of Service of Subpoena]
  • September 26, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.