U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02357
  • Case Name: Benton v. Honeywell International
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Amend Scheduling Order]
November, 2024
  • November 11, 2024: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • September 27, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [Scheduling Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.