U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-40023-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Cushing et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [PS42 Consent to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Continuance of Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Entry of Appearance by USA]
  • March 27, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Petition and Order to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • March 27, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea (to court)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Waiver]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration of Detention Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 02, 2024: [Reconsideration of Detention Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • September 27, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - Public]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 26, 2024: [SEALED Motion]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.