U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02296
  • Case Name: Coles v. Overland Park, Kansas, City of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 03, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.