U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02365
  • Case Name: Commercial Capital Company, L.L.C. et al v. American Tow & Recovery, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 12, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • May 12, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • March 12, 2025: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Answer to Counterclaim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.