U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02227
  • Case Name: Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA, Inc. et al v. Dechra Veterinary Products, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 16, 2025: [Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [ESI Protocol]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Answer to Counterclaim]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 26, 2024: [Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.