U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01011
  • Case Name: Garcia-Parra v. Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Jury Demand]
  • April 22, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • April 15, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Stay Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Service]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 26, 2024: [Return of Service of Subpoena]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.