U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02372
  • Case Name: AGI Suretrack, LLC v. Tackett et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
  • May 12, 2025: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Amend Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Jury Demand]
  • October 07, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Status Conference]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 26, 2024: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.