U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03132
  • Case Name: Cheatham (ID 96193) v. Dedeke et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • May 08, 2025: [Recusal]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • April 18, 2025: [Review]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • April 03, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Certified Mail Receipt Returned]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Index of Exhibits]
  • March 27, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 25, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Produce]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 08, 2024: [Supplement]
  • October 08, 2024: [Reconsideration]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 07, 2024: [Amend Complaint]
  • October 07, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Dismissing Appeal]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 01, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 01, 2024: [Hearing]
  • October 01, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2024: [Supplement]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines]
  • September 26, 2024: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 26, 2024: [Stay Deadlines]
  • September 26, 2024: [Appeal Number Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.