U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02474
  • Case Name: Peck v. Schlage Lock Company, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Trial Order]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.