U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-04050
  • Case Name: Howard v. Kansas Wesleyan University
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - Public]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [ADR Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Protective Order]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • September 26, 2024: [Discovery Hearing]
  • September 26, 2024: [Scheduling Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.