U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02366
  • Case Name: SERIES 17-03-615 et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 09, 2024: [Stay Discovery]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2024: [Transcript]
  • October 02, 2024: [Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.