U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02339
  • Case Name: CST Industries, Inc. v. Tank Connections, L.L.C
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Appeal Number Information]
  • May 09, 2025: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 07, 2025: [Alter Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Unsealing of Provisionally Sealed Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Provisionally Sealed Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 10, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
February, 2025
  • February 03, 2025: [Redacted Document]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits]
  • January 30, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
November, 2024
  • November 22, 2024: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 15, 2024: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 15, 2024: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 07, 2024: [Reply/Objection to Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2024: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 02, 2024: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 02, 2024: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 02, 2024: [Seal or Redact Document(s)]
September, 2024
  • September 25, 2024: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
  • September 25, 2024: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Response to Motion]
  • September 25, 2024: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.