U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02336
  • Case Name: Duncan et al v. Topeka, Kansas, City of, et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 10, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.