U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01124
  • Case Name: Ponce v. Sedgwick County, Kansas, Board of County Commissioners, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 30, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Expediting Briefing Deadline]
  • April 04, 2025: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Setting Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2024: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 09, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.