U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-04093
  • Case Name: Gorsline et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reconsideration]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Strike]
January, 2025
  • January 20, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Return of Service]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Designation of Place of Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.