U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01171
  • Case Name: Horinek v. Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 30, 2024: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 30, 2024: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 27, 2024: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.