U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-cv-01231
  • Case Name: Pray v. Sedgwick County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Terminating Referral Judge]
  • April 28, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.