U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02073
  • Case Name: Borsody v. FedEx Ground
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Dismissing Appeal]
December, 2024
  • December 24, 2024: [Response to Motion]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • October 03, 2024: [Discovery Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.