U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cr-10090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea (to court)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2024: [SEALED Pretrial Bond Report]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Detention]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention (Oral)]
  • September 30, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 30, 2024: [Detention (Oral)]
  • September 30, 2024: [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Detention]
  • September 27, 2024: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • September 27, 2024: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • September 27, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2024: [Arrest]
  • September 27, 2024: [Continue]
  • September 27, 2024: [Hearing]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.