U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-03058
  • Case Name: Stewart v. Dominicis et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge]
  • May 09, 2025: [Lifting Stay]
  • May 09, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • September 30, 2024: [Reassigning Case - Minute]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.