U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-cv-01078
  • Case Name: Garrels v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Administratively Closing Case]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2024
  • November 14, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 09, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 08, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2024: [Reply]
  • October 04, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 01, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Leave]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.