U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02394
  • Case Name: Little v. Gray Media Group, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 24, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2025
  • January 18, 2025: [Exhibits in Support of Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.