U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02418
  • Case Name: Happy Feet - Legends International, Inc. v. Borm et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amend Scheduling Order]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • September 27, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.