U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02234
  • Case Name: Eickhoff et al v. Scannell Properties #516, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Comparative Fault Designation]
October, 2024
  • October 17, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • October 11, 2024: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • October 11, 2024: [Leave]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Service]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.