U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cr-10013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hanes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Entry of Appearance for Other Party]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 22, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 14, 2025: [Service by Publication]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.