U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-04024
  • Case Name: Towers v. Unified Government of Wyandotte County and Kansas City, Kansas
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • May 07, 2025: [Return of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: [Return of Service of Summons UNEXECUTED]
  • May 07, 2025: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • May 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • May 02, 2025: [Affidavit]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Alias Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
February, 2025
  • February 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
January, 2025
  • January 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
November, 2024
  • November 07, 2024: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Response]
  • October 11, 2024: [Surreply]
  • October 08, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 08, 2024: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 04, 2024: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2024: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 03, 2024: [Joinder]
  • October 03, 2024: [Leave]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.