U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01094
  • Case Name: Piovan-Antequera v. Gossen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Out of Time]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Leave to File Out of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 03, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 02, 2024: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.