U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01055
  • Case Name: Pathways Management Services, LLC et al v. Northstar Hospital et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Striking]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Expediting Briefing Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 31, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 20, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2024
  • December 06, 2024: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Joint Mediation Notice]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.