U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02097
  • Case Name: LM Insurance Corporation v. Smart Framing Construction LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Review]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Surreply]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines]
  • October 01, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.