U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02252
  • Case Name: Hickles v. FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 05, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2024: [Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.