U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02346
  • Case Name: Pieloch et al v. Dechra Limited et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2024
  • November 01, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 27, 2024: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.