U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02426
  • Case Name: Tahirkheli v. Ascension Via Christi Hospital Pittsburg, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Alias Summons Issued]
  • October 04, 2024: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.