U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01123
  • Case Name: Kerstner v. USD 107 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Settlement]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Settlement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 08, 2024: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 07, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 07, 2024: [Withdraw]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • September 30, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.