U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02445
  • Case Name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Genesh, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2025: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [Joint Mediation Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • April 22, 2025: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 20, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2025: [Substitute Party]
  • April 16, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 31, 2025: [Expert Witness Designation]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 19, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • March 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 13, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
December, 2024
  • December 07, 2024: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
November, 2024
  • November 23, 2024: [Strike]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 30, 2024: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.