U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02059
  • Case Name: Bloomer v. HMG Park Manor of Westwood LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Exclude Expert Testimony]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
January, 2025
  • January 04, 2025: [Exhibits]
  • January 01, 2025: [Expert Witness Designation]
November, 2024
  • November 28, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Amend Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.