U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02287
  • Case Name: Hobbs v. Sunflower Bank, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Protective Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.