U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-04005
  • Case Name: Spiehs v. Armbrister et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 01, 2024: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 01, 2024: [Leave]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 30, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.