U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-03260
  • Case Name: Grissom (ID 33728) v. Bell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appeal Number Information]
  • April 02, 2025: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Expedite]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 02, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 01, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Report and Recommendations]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.