U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02427
  • Case Name: Beerman v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Electronic Filing Registration Form in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 03, 2024: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.