U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01032
  • Case Name: Benbrook v. Pathways Holdings, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 05, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 14, 2024: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 02, 2024: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.