U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02136
  • Case Name: Methods Research, Inc. v. Ottawa Bancshares, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 29, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sanctions]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 27, 2025: [Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • March 21, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 12, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Telephone Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.