U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-03172
  • Case Name: Jones v. Armbrister et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Affidavit]
  • October 10, 2024: [Supplement]
  • October 08, 2024: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 07, 2024: [Joinder]
  • October 07, 2024: [Supplement]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Supplement]
  • October 01, 2024: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • October 01, 2024: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.