U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02084
  • Case Name: Sterba v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 09, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Administratively Closing Case]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Setting Telephone Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
January, 2025
  • January 26, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • October 01, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 01, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.